Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Sponsored by
Senators Miller and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition of "serious offense" to remove a certain limitation on offenses that are included for purposes relating to representation by the Office of the Public Defender.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0918
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1017 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-101, 16-204 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:32 PM