Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms – Study
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Hayes, Smith, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to study and identify certain information relating to certain firearm crimes, injuries, fatalities, and crime firearms; requiring all State and local law enforcement agencies and other governmental units to provide the Office of the Attorney General with any and all information necessary to complete the study; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020, December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1629
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618474/1
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {618474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime - Study
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {618474/1 52AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 52AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Committee Amendment {618474/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General – Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms – Study
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page