Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $10,000 to $25,000 the maximum amount of compensatory damages that may be awarded to an owner of a pet from a person who tortiously causes an injury to or death of the pet while acting individually or through an animal under the person's ownership, direction, or control.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0992
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/10/2020 2:31 PM