Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Apprenticeship and Training Council – Journeyworker–Apprentice Ratios – Electrical Craft or Trade
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Apprenticeship and Training Council, on or before October 1, 2021, to adopt regulations establishing a certain ratio of journeyworkers to apprentices employed in the electrical craft or trade; prohibiting the Council from establishing a ratio of less than a certain amount; requiring an employer in the electrical craft or trade to comply with certain regulations; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to investigate a certain suspected violation under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1470 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Apprenticeship and Training Council – Journeyworker–Apprentice Ratios – Electrical Craft or Trade
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:30 PM