Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - State Innovation Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the State Innovation Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose, use, and contents of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of General Services to administer the Fund; requiring the Secretary to establish the State Innovation Program in accordance with certain requirements; requiring certain information regarding the Program to be posted on a certain website; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of General Services - State Innovation Program and Fund - Establishment
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1201 through 4-1204, 6-226 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:29 PM