Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Felony Murder to review the provisions, penalties, and jurisprudence for felony murder, including its applicability to juveniles, in the State and in other states; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations regarding the current statutory scheme for felony murder to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1308
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838170/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {838170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {838170/1 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Committee Amendment {838170/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 52
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Judiciary 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:26 PM