Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Feldman, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Lee, Waldstreicher, and West
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to design a voluntary developmental disability self-disclosure card; establishing certain requirements for the card; requiring the Administration to consult with certain groups in designing the card; requiring the Administration to make the card available to certain individuals on request; and prohibiting the Administration from keeping records related to the issuance of the card, subject to a certain exception.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1118
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {208078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration - Records - Voluntary Disclosure of Developmental Disability
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 21
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {208078/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-118.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:25 PM