Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purposes for which certain anatomical gifts may be used; repealing provisions of law that require certain persons to search certain individuals for a document of gift or any other information identifying the individual as a donor, that specify procedures to be taken if a document is located, and that concern certain administrative sanctions; requiring a certain procurement organization to make a certain search of certain registries under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1133
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898275/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {898275/1 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {898275/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-509, 4-510, 4-512 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:24 PM