Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Apprenticeship Maryland 2030
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Career and Technology Education Committee; requiring the Committee to establish certain statewide goals for career and technical education; stating the purpose of the Career and Technology Education Innovation Grant in fiscal years 2021 or 2022; requiring the Committee to administer the Career and Technology Education Innovation Grant; extending the termination date for a certain tax credit; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Apprenticeship Maryland 2030
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Apprenticeship Maryland 2030
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/19/2020 2/20/2020 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   21-202, 21-204, 21-205, 21-207, 7-111 )
(   11-106, 11-702, 11-708 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:24 PM