Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Lee, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing certain discharge permits to a person for a new industrial poultry operation or for the purpose of extending or expanding an industrial poultry operation in operation on or before September 30, 2020.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1312
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-323, 9-323.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:23 PM