Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Residential Service Agency Services
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide services provided by a residential service agency that has a certain license and is accredited by the Joint Commission on Home Care.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Residential Service Agency Services
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:23 PM
Click to return on the top page