Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which general contractors are jointly and severally liable for violations of the wage payment and collection law by subcontractors; prohibiting an obligation of contract right from being impaired by the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0956
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 12:43 PM