Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Employee Compensation - Overtime Pay
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing and altering certain rates of overtime pay for certain work performed by certain employees of the Executive Branch of State government to one and one-half times the employee's regular hourly rate of pay for time worked in excess of 80 hours up to and including 100 hours in a 2-week period and two times the employee's regular hourly rate of pay for time worked in excess of 100 hours in the 2-week work period; and providing for the application of certain provisions of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Employee Compensation - Overtime Pay
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Personnel - Employee Compensation - Overtime Pay
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:22 PM