Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing minimum fines of $150 for certain traffic violations relating to the driver of a vehicle failing to stop or yield to certain pedestrian and bicycle traffic; altering the source of funds for the Pedestrian Safety Fund; and requiring the Secretary of Transportation, in administering the Fund, to prioritize enhancing the safety and quality of pedestrian and bicycle transportation near schools and school bus stops.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0973
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-202, 21-204, 21-502, 21-502.1, 21-504, 21-511, 21-705, 21-706, 21-707 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:22 PM