Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Occupational Licenses - Waiver of Application Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring units of the Maryland Department of Labor to waive certain application fees for certain applicants who hold valid out-of-state licenses in good standing from a state whose licensure requirements exceed or are substantially equivalent to the requirements of this State; authorizing a unit to adopt regulations to carry out certain provisions of this Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Labor - Occupational Licenses - Waiver of Application Fees
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
(   2.5-101, 2.5-105, 2-111 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:21 PM
Click to return on the top page