Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting reducing or terminating temporary cash assistance for certain individuals under certain circumstances; prohibiting reducing or terminating temporary cash assistance for certain individuals because of good cause as determined by the Secretary of Human Services; requiring local departments of social services to provide a conciliatory period of 30 days to certain individuals who are not in compliance with the Family Investment Program; requiring 25% of funding be withheld upon certain acts of noncompliance; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1313
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487178/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {487178/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Text - Third - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Appropriations 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-308, 5-309, 5-310, 5-312 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:20 PM