Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance, Health Care Facilities, and Providers - Balance Billing - Limitations
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Defining "health care facility-based physician" for the purpose of applying certain provisions of law relating to the assignment of benefits and the reimbursement of nonpreferred providers who are physicians to physicians based in certain health care facilities; requiring a carrier to provide certain coverage and apply certain cost-sharing requirements for certain services under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance, Health Care Facilities, and Providers - Balance Billing - Limitations
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-710.1 )
(   14-201, 14-205, 14-205.1, 14-205.2, 14-205.3, 15-6A-01 through 15-6A-07 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:20 PM