Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson, Lam, Benson, Hough, Lee, Peters, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before October 1, 2021, minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services to comply with certain health and wellness standards adopted by the Secretary of Health; requiring certain training standards adopted by the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to include certain standards for health care workers; requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt dietary standards for certain health facilities on or before October 1, 2021, that comply with certain health and wellness standards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0819
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-308, 21-1301, 21-1302 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:20 PM