Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Rosapepe, West, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a public general law may not be construed to limit a power or function of a local government unless the public general law specifically states that it limits concurrent jurisdiction or that the State's jurisdiction is exclusive; providing for the construction of the Act; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1522
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:19 PM
Click to return on the top page