Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible apprentice" for purposes of a certain credit against the State income tax for the employment of certain eligible apprentices to include certain individuals employed through a youth apprenticeship program; prohibiting a taxpayer from claiming the credit for more than five eligible apprentices in a taxable year; altering the amount of the credit to $3,000 for certain apprentices; altering the maximum amount of credits that may be approved in the aggregate each year to $15,000 per taxpayer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1457
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {889238/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {775769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (132-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {889238/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Ways and Means 49
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {775769/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (132-1) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Text - Chapter - Apprenticeship Start-Up Act of 2020
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:47 PM