Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law specifying that certain provisions of law apply only to adoptions in which a juvenile court enters an order for adoption on or after January 1, 2000; altering, from 21 to 18, the age at which an adoptee, or biological parent if the adoptee is at least a certain age, may apply for a copy of certain birth and adoptions records; requiring the Director of Social Services to develop and make available a certain contact preference form; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1039
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-321, 5-339, 5-351, 5-359, 5-3A-19, 5-3A-35, 5-3A-42, 5-3B-21, 5-3B-29, 5-4B-01, 5-4B-02, 5-4B-11 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:19 PM