Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting the transfer of a used vehicle from a business entity to a majority owner of the business entity from the requirement to obtain a motor vehicle safety inspection certificate if the vehicle is primarily driven by the majority owner of the business entity and the business entity has been dissolved or is in the process of dissolution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1315
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {828571/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Senate 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {828571/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page