Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Feldman, King, Rosapepe, Sydnor, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Aging to pay to certain low-income seniors a $1,000 subsidy from State general funds to help low-income seniors reside in assisted living programs; increasing, except under certain circumstances, a certain subsidy in effect for certain periods of time based on annual growth in a certain consumer price index; requiring the Secretary, beginning March 1, 2023, to determine and announce the growth in the consumer price index over a certain period of time, if any, and a new subsidy for low-income seniors; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0564
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-211 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:15 PM