Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Hayes, Kelley, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Granting collective bargaining rights to graduate students within the University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0214
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0491 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-102, 3-403 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:15 PM