Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Access to Firearms – Storage Requirements (Jaelynn’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Elfreth, Feldman, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lam, Lee, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Hettleman, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition to prohibit a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where a minor could gain access to the firearm; altering a certain exception to the prohibition; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; prohibiting a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where an unsupervised minor could gain access to the firearm and an unsupervised minor does gain access to the firearm, and the firearm causes harm to the minor or another person; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0636
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228870/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228870/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228870/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {463920/1 (Senator Bailey)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {463920/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {743824/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (18-27)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {228870/1 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {228870/1 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hough) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {228870/1 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {463920/1 (Senator Bailey) 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {463920/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (16-28) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {743824/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (18-27) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Text - Third - Public Safety – Access to Firearms – Storage Requirements (Jaelynn’s Law)
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (29-16) 52
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Judiciary 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/4/2020 5:21 PM