Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Mobile Response and Stabilization System for Children and Families in Maryland - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Klausmeier, and Hayes
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health and the Governor's Commission to Study Mental and Behavioral Health in Maryland jointly to take certain actions in order to develop and implement a comprehensive mobile response and stabilization system for children and families in the State; and requiring the Department and the Commission jointly to submit their findings and recommendations to certain committees in the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1140
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Mobile Response and Stabilization System for Children and Families in Maryland - Study
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {707170/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Health - Mobile Response and Stabilization System for Children and Families in Maryland - Study
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:13 PM