Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Feldman, and Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, rather than authorizing, the Injured Workers' Insurance Fund to be the third-party administrator for the State's Self-Insured Workers' Compensation Program for State Employees under a contract with the State; authorizing the Fund to use nonsupervisory employees of the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company; authorizing nonsupervisory employees of the Company to be assigned to perform certain functions under a certain contract; altering the membership of the Board for the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0099
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Economic Matters 44
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:30 PM