Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under certain circumstances for golf carts in Cecil County; providing that a person who operates a golf cart in Cecil County may operate the golf cart only on certain highways at certain times and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; requiring a person who operates a golf cart on a highway in Cecil County to keep as far to the right of the roadway as feasible and possess a valid driver's license; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0575
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page