Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Harford County to be equal to the salary of the Department of State Police lieutenant colonel, at the highest available step for a lieutenant colonel under the Department of State Police pay plan in effect on the day prior to the day that the Sheriff begins a term of office; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1177
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable Adopted 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed 33
Text - Third - Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 36
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Text - Chapter - Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:12 PM