Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly and Ready
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that multiple thefts committed by the same person in multiple counties under one scheme or continuing course of conduct may be aggregated and prosecuted in a certain county; applying certain penalties; altering a certain reference to the maximum value of certain property or services applicable to misdemeanor theft; requiring a court to make finding as to whether a certain crime is organized retail theft; providing that the State has the burden of proving that a certain crime is organized retail theft; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0830
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {248479/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {248479/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judiciary 49AClick to view Recorded Media
(   7-103 )
(   2-203, 6-235 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:12 PM
Click to return on the top page