Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 232
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation; to provide technical assistance to small businesses in the State seeking grants under certain federal programs; requiring small businesses to meet certain qualifications for participation in the Program; authorizing the Corporation, in accordance with certain provisions of law, to procure a nonprofit organization located in the State to provide services under the Program; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0521
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {947174/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 232
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {947174/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Ways and Means 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 232
Text - Chapter - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page