Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Guzzone
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Jobs Court Pilot Program in the District Court sitting in Baltimore City to reduce recidivism by offering defendants an opportunity to participate in full-time job training and job placement programs as a condition of probation, as an alternative to incarceration, or a condition of pretrial release; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts, in consultation with the Baltimore Workforce Development Board, to make a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2025; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - District Court - Jobs Court Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288473/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - District Court - Jobs Court Pilot Program
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {288473/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judiciary 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM