Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to study certain matters relating to the Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students and make recommendations regarding any statutory or regulatory changes to the program; requiring, by December 31, 2020, the Department to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education, and the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0522
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM