Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to extend the period of time that an identification card remains effective by 90 days under certain circumstances; altering the documentation that applicants for a learner's permit who are under the age of 16 years are required to present to the Administration; altering the time period before expiration within which a driver's license is renewable; altering the standards for determining whether an individual is required to appear in person to renew the individual's driver's license; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0730
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page