Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Carter, Hettleman, and Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 281
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a State's Attorney to record certain information if a State's Attorney obtains certain testimony from an in-custody witness and to report certain information to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; requiring the Office to securely store and maintain certain information; providing that the Office may only disclose certain information to certain persons; requiring a State's Attorney to comply with certain discovery requirements; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0637
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 281
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {928972/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judiciary 47
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49B
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 281
Text - Chapter - Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:00 PM