Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Gallion, Jennings, Patterson, Peters, Ready, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Program; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding opportunities for veteran-owned small business enterprises to participate in State procurement contracts and the improvement of the veteran-owned small business enterprise program; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1007
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {897878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
41
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {897878/1 Adopted 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 41
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:09 PM