Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Kagan, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 117
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the housing policy of the State to include providing for fair housing to all citizens regardless of source of income; stating the Act seeks to deconcentrate poverty by providing additional opportunities for tenants utilizing public subsidies to live in certain neighborhoods; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or rent a dwelling to any person because of source of income; establishing qualifications and limitations on the prohibition against discrimination in housing based on source of income; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0231
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0812 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838173/1
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838173/1
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable as Amended Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {263922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {543524/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (43-92)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {583828/1 (Delegate Buckel)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (43-94)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 117
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {838173/1 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 30
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {838173/1 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable as Amended Adopted 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Floor Amendment {263922/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29) 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 33
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 34
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed 43A
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Floor Amendment {543524/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (43-92) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Floor Amendment {583828/1 (Delegate Buckel) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (43-94) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Returned Passed 45
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 117
Text - Chapter - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:31 PM