Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to adopt regulations requiring electric companies and electric cooperatives to adopt a method for an electricity supplier enrolling a certain customer to provide certain information to adequately identify the customer without using the customer's account number; requiring the regulations to require that a certain customer enrolling with an electricity supplier may offer certain information as proof of identity under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1019
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Reassigned to Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page