Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0524 - 2020RS
   CH0006 - 2021RS
Title
Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Kagan, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Serafini, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public library from charging a fine for overdue library materials on a minor's library materials; prohibiting a public library from charging a fee for a minor's overdue library materials until 21 days after the date the materials were due; requiring a public library to cancel or return a fee if a book is returned; requiring the Governor to include $7,500,000 in fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter in the annual operating or capital budget for county library capital projects; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1000
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {874935/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (125-10)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-13)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Overridden (30-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (98-37)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {874935/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (125-10) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (122-13) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Overridden (30-15)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (98-37)
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
(   23-409 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page