Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Rosapepe, Serafini, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes; requiring the Council to study the use of images of student athletes, rule changes by a certain collegiate association, health-related issues, including resources for prevention of sports-related injuries, and other issues related to student athletes; requiring the Council to report its findings and recommendations to the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland and the Board of Regents of Morgan State University; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0533
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, July 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-201, 14-101, 14-102, 15-126, 15-127 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:09 PM