Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit to wear, carry, or transport a handgun without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary of State Police to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval if the applicant meets certain requirements except the certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy the firearms training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0114 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judiciary 38
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:08 PM