Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Sponsored by
Senators West, Sydnor, and Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, when sentencing a minor convicted as an adult, to impose a sentence less than the minimum term required by law; prohibiting a court from imposing a sentence of life without the possibility of parole or release for a minor; authorizing an individual convicted as an adult for an offense committed as a minor to file a motion to reduce the duration of the individual's sentence; requiring the court to conduct a hearing on a motion to reduce the duration of a sentence; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0409
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   6-235, 8-110 )
Last Updated: 2/18/2021 5:19 PM
Click to return on the top page