Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini, Bailey, Beidle, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Peters, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System to receive credit for certain military service even if the member receives military service credit in another retirement system.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1027
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0503 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:07 PM