Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2022, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program from including a frequency limitation on dental prophylaxis care or oral health exams that requires the dental prophylaxis care or oral health exams to be provided at an interval greater than 120 days within a plan year.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0547
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2021
Legislative Date
1/24/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Senate 1/24/2021 1/24/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/17/2021 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page