Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Sydnor, Carter, Hayes, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an annual appropriation of $3,000,000 to be used for branches of the Enoch Pratt Free Library that extend operating hours and services above those in effect as of January 1, 2016; declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly to utilize increased operating hours and services to advance the library's commitment to equity, inclusion, and greater access to library resources, programs, and services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0436
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
Senate 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/4/2021 3:20 PM
Click to return on the top page