Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations establishing standards and requirements for aftermarket safety glass replacement that include certain requirements and meet or exceed certain standards and requirements; and defining "aftermarket safety glass replacement" as motor vehicle safety glass replacement services that occur after the original installation by a vehicle manufacturer.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0519
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krimm) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {378572/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krimm) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 1:30 PM
Click to return on the top page