Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Aquaculture Coordinating Council, in consultation with the Department of the Environment, to review the policies of the Department regarding the application of State or tidal wetlands license and permit requirements to aquaculture operations in the State, and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, on the Council's recommendations, including any proposed legislation on changes needed to eliminate redundancies and conflicts in the oversight of aquaculture operations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0799
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Aquaculture Leases and Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484139/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {460713/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Aquaculture Leases and Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {484139/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {460713/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:15 PM
Click to return on the top page