Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Griffith, Hester, Lam, Patterson, Smith, Sydnor, Washington, Guzzone, McCray, Peters, King, Elfreth, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Providing, under certain circumstances, that the provisions of the Minority Business Enterprise Program apply to public-private partnerships; altering, from July 1, 2020, to July 1, 2023, the date by which certain provisions of law relating to minority business participation goals are of no effect and may not be enforced; incorporating certain findings and evidence associated with the Program; requiring certain applicants for certain wind projects to comply with the Program to a certain extent; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0313
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {299638/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {550216/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-4)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Minority Business Enterprise Program
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {299638/1 Adopted 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships and Video Lottery Terminals
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations 41
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {550216/1 Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49B
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-4) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Text - Chapter - Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:05 PM