Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to ensure that each public school provide, at no charge to students, menstrual hygiene products via dispensers in the restrooms at the school; requiring a public middle or high school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least two restrooms on or before October 1, 2021, and certain restrooms on or before August 1, 2025; and requiring a public elementary school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least one restroom by October 1, 2021.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0205
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Senate 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Age
(   7-447 )
Last Updated: 2/15/2021 9:54 AM
Click to return on the top page