Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Augustine, Beidle, Kagan, Lam, Peters, Pinsky, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 277
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2021 the use of Class B fire- fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals for certain testing or training purposes; providing that this Act does not restrict the manufacture, sale, or distribution of certain fire-fighting foam or the discharge or other use of certain fire-fighting foam in certain operations; requiring the use of nonfluorinated foam for fire-fighting training; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0581
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624330/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {946487/1
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {946487/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (128-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 277
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {624330/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {946487/1 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {946487/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (128-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 277
Text - Chapter - Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
(   6-1601 through 6-1605 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page